TN HB0108 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 862
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 862
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, in cases where an ultrasound is performed as part of an examination prior to an abortion, the person who performs the ultrasound to offer the woman the opportunity to learn the results of the ultrasound; requires, if ultrasound is performed, that report of abortion indicate whether or not a heartbeat was detected. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, requires, in cases where an ultrasound is performed as part of an examination prior to an abortion, the person who performs the ultrasound to offer the woman the opportunity to learn the results of the ultrasound; requires, if ultrasound is performed, that report of abortion indicate whether or not a heartbeat was detected. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] |
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. John Holsclaw [R] |
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. David Alexander [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] |
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] |
Rep. Timothy Wirgau [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 862 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2019 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 4 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1061) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 72, Nays 22, PNV 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 72, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0672) |
2018-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/12/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/8/2018 |
2018-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/6/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 1/31/2018 |
2018-01-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 1/17/2018 |
2017-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2017-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2018 |
2017-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0244 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 862