TN HB0108 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 158
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 158
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Teaching Evaluation Enhancement Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Teaching Evaluation Enhancement Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. David Alexander [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Pub. Ch. 158 | |
2015-04-27 | Effective date(s) 04/16/2015 | |
2015-04-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2015-03-26 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 1 - HA0159) |
2015-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning SubCommittee for 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-17 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Reset on Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee cal. for next meeting. |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning SubCommittee for 2/17/2015 |
2015-01-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning SubCommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-01-17 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0119 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 158