TN HB0106 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, limits the number of times that a developer, business entity, or individual working on behalf of the developer or business entity is permitted to contact a property owner to make an unsolicited offer to buy the property owner's property; allows a property owner who believes a developer has violated the limitation to submit a complaint to the consumer affairs division in the office of the attorney general; adds additional requirements and penalties for a violation. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2; Title 47 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2; Title 47 and Title 66, relative to consumer protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Withdrawn. |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |