TN HB0100 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that petitions for appointment of a conservator include results of searches of the proposed conservator in the department of health's registry of persons who have abused, neglected, or misappropriated the property of vulnerable persons and the national sex offender registry. - Amends TCA Title 34.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 34, relative to guardianship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2022 | |
2021-04-12 | Pub. Ch. 84 | |
2021-04-07 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0167 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 84