TN HB0096 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 342
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 342
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions related to information reports of sales of beer and tobacco products. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 1 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions related to information reports of sales of beer and tobacco products. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 1 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 342 | |
2015-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-01-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-01-17 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0107 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 342