TN HB0094 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/2/2021
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Hearing: Mar 2 @ 10:30 am in House Hearing Room I
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires disputes concerning an employer's failure to provide medical care and treatment, medical services or medical benefits, or both, to meet certain requirements; removes requirement that all compensation be paid prior to an employee qualifying for vocational recovery assistance; extends current provisions, as amended, for four years; authorizes workers' compensation judges to conduct judicial settlement conferences. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 2, relative to workers' compensation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/2/2021
2021-02-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Commerce Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0764 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback