TN HB0091 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Hearing: Mar 2 @ 10:30 am in House Hearing Room I
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from 20 to 30 years the amount of time within which loans from the drinking water revolving loan fund must be amortized; increases from 30 to 40 years the time within which such loans must be amortized when made to disadvantaged communities. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 221, Part 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 221, Part 12, relative to the drinking water revolving loan fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-02-24HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/2/2021
2021-02-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
2021-02-09HouseAssigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee
2021-02-09HouseRef. to Commerce Committee
2021-01-13HouseCaption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0740 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback