TN HB0091 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain amounts of work, community service, education, or job-seeking activities for recipients of food assistance (SNAP) unless certain exemptions apply. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires certain amounts of work, community service, education, or job-seeking activities for recipients of food assistance (SNAP) unless certain exemptions apply. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] |
Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Mark Lovell [R] |
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. John Holsclaw [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] |
Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] | Rep. David Alexander [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] |
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass if am; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1172 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee