TN HB0091 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes individuals or entities to correspond with the department of labor and workforce development through electronic means; requires employers to file a portion of the wage and premium report electronically in a format prescribed by the commissioner; revises other various unemployment compensation provisions. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7, Part 1; Section 50-7-304; Section 50-7-404; Section 50-7-501; Section 50-7-503 and Section 50-7-715.
Title
As enacted, authorizes individuals or entities to correspond with the department of labor and workforce development through electronic means; requires employers to file a portion of the wage and premium report electronically in a format prescribed by the commissioner; revises other various unemployment compensation provisions. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7, Part 1; Section 50-7-304; Section 50-7-404; Section 50-7-501; Section 50-7-503 and Section 50-7-715.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 95 | |
2015-03-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/26/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass if am. by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2015-01-17 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0102 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 95
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0091&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0091.pdf |