TN HB0087 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/25/2023, 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises law relative to garagekeeper's or towing firm's liens, unclaimed or abandoned vehicles and notification of owners and lienholders, and motor vehicle storage. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 47; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 65 and Title 66.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 47; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 65 and Title 66, relative to transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02 Effective date(s) 04/25/2023, 07/01/2023
2023-05-02 Pub. Ch. 229
2023-04-25 Signed by Governor.
2023-04-13HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2023-04-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-03-31HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2023-03-30SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2023-03-30SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0125)
2023-03-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2023-03-20SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2023-03-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-03-16HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-03-16HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-16HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0084)
2023-03-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2023
2023-03-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-03-01HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/7/2023
2023-03-01HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2023-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/1/2023
2023-02-21HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2023-02-21HouseRef. to Transportation Committee
2023-01-12HouseCaption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-01-12HouseP2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees
2023-01-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1337 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 229

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback