TN HB0087 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, designates the week beginning on the first Sunday in April as Financial Literacy Week in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, designates the week beginning on the first Sunday in April as Financial Literacy Week in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-02-28HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/4/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019
2019-02-26HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/26/2019
2019-01-28HouseP2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2019-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0233 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback