TN HB0085 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Free All Cannabis for Tennesseans Act"; establishes a regulatory structure for the cultivation, processing, and retail sale of marijuana and marijuana products in this state to be administered by the department of agriculture. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 45; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 45; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2023-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-12 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee -- Health Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2023-01-12 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2023-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0168 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee