TN HB0085 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Mar 3 @ 11:00 am in House Hearing Room III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, deletes streamlined sales tax provisions first enacted by Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007 and the implementation of which have been delayed with subsequent legislation; adds definition of "bundled transaction" for purposes of sales and use tax; makes other revisions regarding the sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 157 of the Public Acts of 2019; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 157 of the Public Acts of 2019; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007, relative to sales tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0757 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-23 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback