TN HB0084 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, exempts from sales and use tax services by car wash facilities, coin-operated or otherwise, where the customer remains in custody of the vehicle and the preponderance of the vehicle's wash is completed by the customer or automated equipment. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, exempts from sales and use tax services by car wash facilities, coin-operated or otherwise, where the customer remains in custody of the vehicle and the preponderance of the vehicle's wash is completed by the customer or automated equipment. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24 Pub. Ch. 162
2019-04-24 Effective date(s) 04/18/2019
2019-04-18 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-10HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-09SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-05HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-04SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-04-04SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0217)
2019-04-04SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-02HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-01HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 2, PNV 5
2019-04-01HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0149)
2019-03-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/13/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-01-28HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0237 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 162

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback