TN HB0082 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes state employment protections for members of the national guard, state guard, and civil air patrol called to active state duty equivalent to the federal Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act of 1994 (USERRA) for members of the national guard called to federal active service. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 33.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 33, relative to employment protections for members of the Tennessee national guard, Tennessee state guard, and civil air patrol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 284 | |
2021-04-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-14 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0754 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 284