TN HB0081 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 292
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 292
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to the regulation of petroleum underground storage tanks and waste; gives an owner or operator of an underground tank the option to request a refund of the annual fee or a waiver or reduction of the penalties in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211, Part 1; Title 68, Chapter 212 and Title 68, Chapter 215, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to the regulation of petroleum underground storage tanks and waste; gives an owner or operator of an underground tank the option to request a refund of the annual fee or a waiver or reduction of the penalties in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211, Part 1; Title 68, Chapter 212 and Title 68, Chapter 215, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 292 | |
2015-04-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-01-17 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0092 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 292
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0081&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0081.pdf |