TN HB0079 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Ref. to Government Operations Committee
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a party issued a notice of violation by an agency to prevail on the merits of all allegations in the notice at the contested case hearing in order to recover reasonable costs from the agency; requires a hearing officer or administrative law judge to set forth in writing facts upon which certain determinations are based; requires parties seeking judicial review of certain agency decisions to cover reasonable costs of the review. - Amends TCA Section 4-5-325 and Section 63-1-144.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 4-5-325 and Section 63-1-144, relative to payment of expenses incurred during proceedings related to contested cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Government Operations Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0747 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback