TN HB0078 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes the Paperwork Reduction and Simplification Act of 1976; redistributes the recordkeeping responsibilities for the state protest committee; revises other various provisions governing state contracts. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 25; Title 4, Chapter 56, Part 1; Title 12, Chapter 3, Part 3 and Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 25; Title 4, Chapter 56, Part 1; Title 12, Chapter 3, Part 3 and Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 1, relative to state government operations.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Scotty Campbell [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 279 | |
2021-04-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0746 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2021