TN HB0078 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases by $500 the minimum fine imposed for a first or second violation of the requirement that a physician who reports suspected sexual abuse due to being requested to perform an abortion on a minor include in that report information regarding the sampling and preservation of embryonic or fetal tissue; increased fine amounts will be $1,000 and $1,500 respectively. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-5116; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 9; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 68 and Section 71-5-157.
Title
As introduced, increases by $500 the minimum fine imposed for a first or second violation of the requirement that a physician who reports suspected sexual abuse due to being requested to perform an abortion on a minor include in that report information regarding the sampling and preservation of embryonic or fetal tissue; increased fine amounts will be $1,000 and $1,500 respectively. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-5116; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 9; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 68 and Section 71-5-157.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2019-01-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1306 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee