TN HB0078 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes property owners to provide notice that trespassing is prohibited on their property by marking trees and posts with purple paint as an alternative to posting signs. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14.
Title
As enacted, authorizes property owners to provide notice that trespassing is prohibited on their property by marking trees and posts with purple paint as an alternative to posting signs. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 286 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0421) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-03-06 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 2 |
2017-03-06 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0027) |
2017-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2017 |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1182 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 286