TN HB0077 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 51-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits abortions from the point a fetal heartbeat is detected; creates exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits abortions from the point a fetal heartbeat is detected; creates exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-03-07HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-03-07HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 65, Nays 21, PNV 7
2019-03-07HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 5 - HA0048)
2019-03-07HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0047)
2019-03-07HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0029)
2019-02-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019
2019-02-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
2019-01-28HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1236 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-22 - Motion to Recall from Committee Tabled, voice vote

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0077&ga=111
Texthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB0077.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0016.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0028.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0029.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0047.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0048.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0049.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/HB0077.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM0040.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM0298.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM0119.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM0373.pdf
Roll Callhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0077&ga=111

Bill Comments

feedback