TN HB0076 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes a department, institution, office, or agency of the state to enter into an agreement with a third party to collect state funds on its behalf under which the third party is permitted to deduct its service fee from the funds collected prior to deposit when such agreement is approved in accordance with present law governing procurement; requires the chief procurement officer to file an annual report listing such approved contracts with the chairs of the finance, ways and means committees of the house and senate. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-301.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 9-4-301, relative to the deposit of state funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03 Effective date(s) 04/20/2021
2021-05-03 Pub. Ch. 172
2021-04-20 Signed by Governor.
2021-04-08HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-04-07SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-03-31HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-03-29SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-03-29SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0132)
2021-03-29SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-03-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-03-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-03-08HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-03-08HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0003)
2021-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021
2021-03-02HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-02-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/2/2021
2021-02-24HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
2021-02-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0743 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 172

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback