TN HB0076 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revises provisions governing assessments in grade 11. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 60.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, revises provisions governing assessments in grade 11. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 60.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-08HouseWithdrawn.
2017-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
2017-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
2017-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-01-19HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback