TN HB0076 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes, rather than requires, tax credits and other economic incentives based on employment to include individuals having a co-employment relationship with a professional employer organization and a client. - Amends TCA Section 62-43-105.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes, rather than requires, tax credits and other economic incentives based on employment to include individuals having a co-employment relationship with a professional employer organization and a client. - Amends TCA Section 62-43-105.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-20 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 84
2015-03-26HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-26HouseComp. SB subst.
2015-03-19HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2015
2015-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015
2015-03-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/17/2015
2015-03-11HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2015
2015-03-04HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2015-03-04HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-02-25HousePlaced on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/4/2015
2015-02-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2015-02-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/24/2015
2015-02-17HouseMeeting Cancelled. Reset on Business and Utilities Subcommittee cal. for next meeting.
2015-02-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/17/2015
2015-02-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-01-17HouseAssigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2015-01-17HouseRef. to Business and Utilities Committee
2015-01-17HouseP2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees
2015-01-16HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-01-15HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0086 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 84

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback