TN HB0076 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Pub. Ch. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allows a representative of the sheriff and county mayor to serve on the governing body of an emergency communications district instead of the present requirement that the sheriff and county mayor serve on the governing body. - Amends TCA Section 7-86-105.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, allows a representative of the sheriff and county mayor to serve on the governing body of an emergency communications district instead of the present requirement that the sheriff and county mayor serve on the governing body. - Amends TCA Section 7-86-105.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-28SenatePub. Ch. 34
2013-03-28SenateEffective date(s) 03/22/2013
2013-03-22SenateSigned by Governor.
2013-03-12SenateTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2013-03-12SenateSigned by S. Speaker
2013-03-11SenateSigned by H. Speaker
2013-03-07SenateEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2013-03-07SenatePassed S., Ayes 27, Nays 0
2013-03-07SenateS. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
2013-02-28HouseRcvd. from H., P1C.
2013-02-25HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2013-02-25HousePassed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0
2013-02-21HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/25/2013
2013-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2013
2013-02-19HouseRec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2013-02-13HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/19/2013
2013-02-13HouseRec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
2013-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/13/2013
2013-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
2013-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2013-01-28HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-01-23HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0293 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 34

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback