TN HB0075 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the period in which notice must be given to the health services and development agency that a health care institution has changed ownership from 30 to 60 days. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, increases the period in which notice must be given to the health services and development agency that a health care institution has changed ownership from 30 to 60 days. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0168 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee