TN HB0074 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, updates the terms "general education development credential," "high school equivalency test," and variations of the terms to "high school equivalency credential." - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 8; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 54; Title 55; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2; Title 4; Title 8; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 54; Title 55; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to high school equivalency credentials.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 114
2023-03-16HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-13HouseComp. SB subst.
2023-03-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2023
2023-03-02HouseAction def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/9/2023
2023-03-01HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2023
2023-03-01HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-02-22HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 3/1/2023
2023-02-14HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
2023-02-08HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/14/2023
2023-02-07HouseAction Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 2/14/2023
2023-02-01HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/7/2023
2023-01-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-12HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2023-01-12HouseRef. to Education Administration
2023-01-11HouseP2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees
2023-01-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0255 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback