TN HB0072 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends for a student who becomes pregnant during the four-month period immediately preceding the date on which the student completes high school in a Tennessee home school program, obtains a GED® or HiSET®, or graduates from high school, the time within which the student must be admitted to, and enrolled in, an eligible postsecondary institution to be eligible for a Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends for a student who becomes pregnant during the four-month period immediately preceding the date on which the student completes high school in a Tennessee home school program, obtains a GED® or HiSET®, or graduates from high school, the time within which the student must be admitted to, and enrolled in, an eligible postsecondary institution to be eligible for a Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseWithdrawn.
2019-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c House Higher Education Subcommittee
2019-01-24HouseP2C, ref. to Education-- Government Operations for Review
2019-01-23HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-22HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback