TN HB0072 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 697
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing the standards recommendations committees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing the standards recommendations committees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 697
2018-03-15HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-03-08HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018
2018-03-06HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-02-28HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/6/2018
2018-02-28HouseSponsor change.
2018-02-28HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
2017-05-08HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-04-12HousePlaced behind the budget
2017-04-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017
2017-04-05HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-04HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 4/4/2017
2017-03-29HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
2017-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
2017-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-01-18HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0574 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 697

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback