TN HB0072 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises various provisions relating to tax reporting by insurance companies. - Amends TCA Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises various provisions relating to tax reporting by insurance companies. - Amends TCA Title 56.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-27 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 155
2015-04-01HouseComp. SB subst.
2015-03-26HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2015
2015-03-25HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/26/2015
2015-03-24HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/24/2015
2015-03-18HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
2015-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
2015-01-17HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2015-01-17HouseRef. to Insurance and Banking Committee
2015-01-17HouseP2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees
2015-01-16HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-01-15HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0082 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 155

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback