TN HB0072 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2013-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides that a church carrying on a Parents' Day Out program may carry on up to two programs during the same calendar week without being subject to licensing requirements, provided that the programs operate on different days and no child attends more than one program. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, provides that a church carrying on a Parents' Day Out program may carry on up to two programs during the same calendar week without being subject to licensing requirements, provided that the programs operate on different days and no child attends more than one program. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2013-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2013-01-28HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-01-23HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0586 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. H&W Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback