TN HB0072 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, raises the age to be an entertainer in a cabaret or other adult-oriented establishment from 18 to 21; requires any political subdivision that has or adopts an ordinance regulating such establishments to require certain information be provided by a person applying for a permit as an entertainer. - Amends TCA Title 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, raises the age to be an entertainer in a cabaret or other adult-oriented establishment from 18 to 21; requires any political subdivision that has or adopts an ordinance regulating such establishments to require certain information be provided by a person applying for a permit as an entertainer. - Amends TCA Title 7.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-13 Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee
2012-03-07 Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/13/2012
2011-04-26 Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee
2011-04-20 Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/26/2011
2011-04-13 Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee
2011-04-06 Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 4/13/2011
2011-04-06 Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 4/13/2011
2011-03-30 Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 4/6/2011
2011-03-30 Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 4/6/2011
2011-03-23 Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/30/2011
2011-02-08 Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG
2011-02-07 P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee
2011-01-15 Intro., P1C.
2011-01-14 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2081 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-22 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback