TN HB0072 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes home-schooled students to participate in athletics in public schools if they comply with certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, authorizes home-schooled students to participate in athletics in public schools if they comply with certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Withdrawn. | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2009-02-09 | Ref. to Education | |
2009-01-15 | P2C held on desk. | |
2009-01-14 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-13 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0843 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0072&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0072.pdf |