TN HB0068 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 220
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 220
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the court, when it deems appropriate, to order an examination of a party pursuant to Rule 35 of the Tennessee Rules of Civil Procedure and, if necessary for the conduct of the proceedings, order the disclosure of confidential mental health information of a party. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 33; Title 36 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the court, when it deems appropriate, to order an examination of a party pursuant to Rule 35 of the Tennessee Rules of Civil Procedure and, if necessary for the conduct of the proceedings, order the disclosure of confidential mental health information of a party. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 33; Title 36 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 220 |
2013-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2013-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-10 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-09 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-04-03 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to last calendar |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-01-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0028 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-07 - Pub. Ch. 220