TN HB0068 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires all closings under the Tennessee Home Loan Protection Act to be attorney supervised closings and only attorneys with sufficient errors and omission insurance, as set annually by the commissioner of financial institutions, shall be authorized to act as supervising attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47, Chapter 32.
Title
As introduced, requires all closings under the Tennessee Home Loan Protection Act to be attorney supervised closings and only attorneys with sufficient errors and omission insurance, as set annually by the commissioner of financial institutions, shall be authorized to act as supervising attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47, Chapter 32.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-02-07 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2011-01-15 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-14 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0068&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0068.pdf |