TN HB0067 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an assignment of a deed of trust to be properly recorded with the register of deeds within 10 days of the date of assignment. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 21, Part 10; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 66, Chapter 24, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires an assignment of a deed of trust to be properly recorded with the register of deeds within 10 days of the date of assignment. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 21, Part 10; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 66, Chapter 24, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-07 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2011-01-15 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1731 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0067&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0067.pdf |