TN HB0066 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, appropriates $120 million from excess state tax revenues over-collected in fiscal year 2016-2017 to the department of transportation to be used for transportation road projects, $20 million of which is earmarked for state-aid roads. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 54 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, appropriates $120 million from excess state tax revenues over-collected in fiscal year 2016-2017 to the department of transportation to be used for transportation road projects, $20 million of which is earmarked for state-aid roads. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 54 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. Barry Doss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to next Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Finance, Ways & Means |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0251 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee