TN HB0065 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the administrative office of the courts to develop and implement a statewide electronic transmission system for judgment orders in criminal cases; requires trial judges to employ the electronic transmission system in each criminal case resulting in a conviction. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 3, Part 8; Title 18, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16, Chapter 3, Part 8; Title 18, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to judgment documents in criminal cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0730 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback