TN HB0065 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from 15 days to 30 days the period of time during which an HMO or a representative of an HMO may request a hearing in response to a cease and desist order from the commissioner of commerce and insurance. - Amends TCA Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases from 15 days to 30 days the period of time during which an HMO or a representative of an HMO may request a hearing in response to a cease and desist order from the commissioner of commerce and insurance. - Amends TCA Title 56.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-01-23HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-22HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1436 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback