TN HB0064 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes the annual application for a certificate of authority by an automobile club or association to a one-time application prior to commencement of operations; provides licenses issued must be renewed annually and include updated documents and information. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 18, relative to automobile clubs and associations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/23/2021
2021-02-16HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/16/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Transportation Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0724 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback