TN HB0064 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes certain requirements regarding records of the state university and community college system and the University of Tennessee system relative to investment programs. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, establishes certain requirements regarding records of the state university and community college system and the University of Tennessee system relative to investment programs. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 285 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2017 | |
2017-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. ( Amendment 1 - SA0355) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 83, Nays 11, PNV 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0334) |
2017-04-13 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0283) |
2017-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0587 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 285