TN HB0062 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, removes the adoption contact veto registry and revises other provisions governing adoption. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1 and Section 68-3-313.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, Chapter 1 and Section 68-3-313, relative to adoption records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 101
2021-03-25HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-03-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-18HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021
2021-03-16HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/16/2021
2021-03-10HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/10/2021
2021-03-03HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-03HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-02-24HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/3/2021
2021-02-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
2021-02-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0723 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 04/07/2021; 07/01/2022

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback