TN HB0062 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-21)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-21)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Dynamic Accessibility Act," which provides for a modern symbol of access for disabled persons. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 12; Title 55 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Dynamic Accessibility Act," which provides for a modern symbol of access for disabled persons. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 12; Title 55 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 112 | |
2019-03-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass, ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/13/2019 |
2019-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0046 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 112