TN HB0062 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-21)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Dynamic Accessibility Act," which provides for a modern symbol of access for disabled persons. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 12; Title 55 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Dynamic Accessibility Act," which provides for a modern symbol of access for disabled persons. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 12; Title 55 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 112
2019-03-18HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-03-14HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
2019-03-11HouseRec. for pass, ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/11/2019
2019-03-05HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-13HouseMeeting Canceled
2019-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/13/2019
2019-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2019-01-24HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-01-23HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-19HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0046 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 112

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback