TN HB0061 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain enforcement provisions of the Tennessee Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 1; Section 53-7-202 and Section 53-7-220.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 53, Chapter 1; Section 53-7-202 and Section 53-7-220, relative to food, drug, and cosmetic safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 202 | |
2021-03-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-16 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/16/2021 |
2021-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0718 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021