TN HB0060 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, rewrites the Soil Conservation Districts Law to be the Soil and Water Conservation Districts Law; makes corresponding changes. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Section 5-9-106; Section 6-58-104; Title 43, Chapter 14; Title 43, Chapter 34; Title 64 and Title 69, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29; Section 5-9-106; Section 6-58-104; Title 43, Chapter 14; Title 43, Chapter 34; Title 64 and Title 69, Chapter 6, relative to soil and water conservation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseWithdrawn.
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-05HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback