TN HB0055 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Spencer Bristol Act," which increases the penalty for evading arrest that results in the serious bodily injury of a law enforcement officer to a Class C felony and evading arrest that results in the death of a law enforcement officer to a Class A felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 6, relative to evading arrest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 278 | |
2021-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-25 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0129 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021