TN HB0055 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-23 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-23 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony punishable only by a fine of not less than $500 nor more than $3,000, the penalty for a person operating a motor vehicle who fails to stop the vehicle upon approaching a school bus. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, increases, from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony punishable only by a fine of not less than $500 nor more than $3,000, the penalty for a person operating a motor vehicle who fails to stop the vehicle upon approaching a school bus. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | House | Withdrawn. |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2019-01-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0055&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB0055.pdf |