TN HB0050 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 04/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "2020 Defense Doctrine," which adds imminent danger of grave sexual abuse as a justification for the use of deadly force in self-defense and to defenses of duress and use of deadly force by law enforcement officer; defines grave sexual abuse as rape, aggravated rape, rape of a child, or aggravated rape of a child. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to criminal law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12 Effective date(s) 04/07/2021
2021-04-12 Pub. Ch. 83
2021-04-07 Signed by Governor.
2021-03-31HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-03-31SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-03-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-03-26HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-03-25HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 86, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0050
2021-03-22HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/25/21
2021-03-18SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-03-18SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0042)
2021-03-18SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-03-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-03-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-03-15HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-03-15HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0016)
2021-03-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2021
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021
2021-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-02-24HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/3/2021
2021-02-24HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-12-17HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0189 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 83

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback