TN HB0050 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-17 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-17 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the Tennessee real estate commission from requiring that a real estate broker continuing education course be longer than one hour. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the Tennessee real estate commission from requiring that a real estate broker continuing education course be longer than one hour. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Business and Utilities Committee--Government Operations for review |
2015-01-16 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0069 (Crossfiled) 2016-02-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0050&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0050.pdf |